Global Patent Index - EP 1013806 A1

EP 1013806 A1 2000-06-28 - Pair of weft carrying and drawing grippers for weaving looms

Title (en)

Pair of weft carrying and drawing grippers for weaving looms

Title (de)

Schussfadengreiferpaar für Webmaschinen

Title (fr)

Paire d'aiguilles passe-trame pour métier à tisser

Publication

EP 1013806 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99106429 A

Priority

IT MI982804 A

Abstract (en)

A pair of weft carrying and drawing grippers in a shuttleless loom - of the type controlled by straps caused to perform a to-and-fro motion with the grippers fixed at the ends thereof - comprises: a stiff structural support element (1; 11) formed with oriented carbon fibers poltruded with a thermosetting material; a metal body (2; 12) carrying the weft yarn gripping devices (P); a wearplate (5; 15) to protect the front bottom part of the gripper; and at least an abutting element (7; 17-17') of filled thermoplastic material. The strap (N), the stiff support element (1; 11), the metal body (2; 12) and the wearplate (5; 15) are connected together by screws (4-6-8; 14-16-18), engaged into threaded metal seats inserted into said abutting element (7; 17-17'), or formed into said metal body (2; 12), or into the weft yarn gripping devices (P). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 47/23

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03J 5/06 (2006.01); D03D 47/23 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/233 (2013.01); D03D 47/236 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[A] US 4757844 A 19880719 - PEZZOLI LUIGI [IT]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1013806 A1 20000628; EP 1013806 B1 20031203; CN 1109144 C 20030521; CN 1257947 A 20000628; DE 69913301 D1 20040115; DE 69913301 T2 20041118; ES 2209264 T3 20040616; HK 1029380 A1 20031017; IT 1304698 B1 20010328; IT MI982804 A1 20000623; KR 20000057083 A 20000915; TW 498117 B 20020811

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070329

2008-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *PROMATECH S.P.A.

- Effective date: 20060331

2007-06-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060330

2007-01-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-10-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061003

2006-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-03-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060330

2005-04-01 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20050401

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-03-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050330

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-03-17 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20050317

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-03-08 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050308

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-03-07 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050307

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-11-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040906

2004-09-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2209264 T3

2004-03-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAAD, BALASS, MENZL & PARTNER AG

2004-01-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69913301 P 20040115

2003-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-12-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR IT LI

2001-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PROMATECH S.P.A.

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001222

2001-03-28 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR IT LI

2001-03-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI