Global Patent Index - EP 1013810 A3

EP 1013810 A3 2001-01-03 - Suede like textile fabric

Title (en)

Suede like textile fabric

Title (de)

Wildlederartiges textiles Flächengebilde

Title (fr)

Etoffe textile à aspect du suéde

Publication

EP 1013810 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99125729 A

Priority

DE 19859871 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1013810A2] The textile fabric, with a suede surface effect, is a knitted material with a three-part structure. The first part is a fabric pattern layout of 2-3/1-0 and the second part is a velvet pattern layout of 1-0/3-4 to 1-0/5-6 and the third part is a tricot pattern layout of 1-0/1-2. Different yarns are used in the three parts. The yarns in the first part form 15-40 wt.% of the total fabric with yarns of 30-150 dtex and separate threads of 2-4 dtex. The yarns of the second part form 30-80 wt.% of the fabric, with a total gauge of 30-100 dtex with a finer separate thread of 0.5-2.0 dtex. The yarns of the third part form 5-40 wt.%, using coarse yarns of 2-50 dtex single threads and a total thickness of up to 50 dtex and preferably 20-50 dtex. The material is a gray fabric with a stitch density of 26-32 stitches/cm, in a fabric weight of 75-350 g/m<2>. An Independent claim is included for a fabric production process where the knitted fabric is composed of three parts and spread out by at least 40% and the surface roughened during a suitable storage. The fabric is formed into a strand for dyeing, and dried on a stenter frame. It is finally shorn and steamed. Preferred Features: The fabric is treated with a water and/or oil repellent when its yarns have not been treated with a flame-resistant medium. The gray fabric weight is 100-350 g/m<2> for furnishings and 75-200 g/m<2> for apparel.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04B 21/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04B 21/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04B 21/16 (2013.01); D10B 2403/0111 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1013810 A2 20000628; EP 1013810 A3 20010103; EP 1013810 B1 20040818; DE 19859871 A1 20000629

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-12-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-05-02 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59910270

- Representative's name: MAI DOERR BESIER PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2005-08-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050519

2005-05-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-09-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59910270 P 20040923

2004-08-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2001-09-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR

2001-07-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010528

2001-05-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TREVIRA GMBH

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI