Global Patent Index - EP 1013814 A1

EP 1013814 A1 2000-06-28 - Shuttle thread monitoring

Title (en)

Shuttle thread monitoring

Title (de)

Schiffchenfaden-Überwachung

Title (fr)

Surveillance de fil de navette

Publication

EP 1013814 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99118508 A

Priority

DE 19859158 A

Abstract (en)

To monitor the presence of the shuttle thread, in a shuttle embroidery machine, sensors (8,9) are placed on the shuttle movement path between the needle hole (3) and the shuttle (1) itself, to register the presence of the lower thread (6) in this zone. The sensors (8,9) monitor the lower thread (6) in the zone between the shuttle guide path (10) and the needle plate (2). At least one sensor (8,9) is in or at the needle plate (2). Or the sensors (8,9) are in or at the shuttle guide path (10), with a mirror surface (11) in or at the needle plate (2). Or the sensors (8,9) are in or at the needle plate (2), with a mirror surface (11) at the shuttle guide path (10). In another form, one sensor (8) is in or at the needle plate (2) and the other sensor (9) is in or at the shuttle guide path (10). The sensors (8,9) are optical sensors or laser-optical sensors. The sensor signals are passed to a switch unit, to stop the embroidery machine if the lower thread is not present at the shuttle.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft eine Schiffchenstickmaschine mit Schiffchen-Faden-Überwachung. Die Faden-Überwachung dient zur Feststellung, ob ein Hinterfaden beim Stickvorgang vorhanden ist oder ob dieser abgerissen oder ausgegangen ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D05C 11/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D05C 11/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D05C 11/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1013814 A1 20000628; DE 19859158 A1 20000629

INPADOC legal status


2002-09-04 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20020706

2002-05-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020404

2001-03-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR IT LI

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001020

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI