Global Patent Index - EP 1013823 A1

EP 1013823 A1 2000-06-28 - Tissue paper product and lotion for its manufacture

Title (en)

Tissue paper product and lotion for its manufacture

Title (de)

Tissuepapierprodukt und Lotion zu seiner Herstellung

Title (fr)

Produit papetier absorbant et lotion pour son production

Publication

EP 1013823 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99123068 A

Priority

DE 19858616 A

Abstract (en)

Toilet tissues with improved softness are made by treating tissue paper based on cellulose fibre material with an aqueous or non-aqueous lotion containing a softener selected from mineral oils, alkyl ethoxylates and fatty acid esters, a quaternary ammonium compound of formula (I) and a polysiloxane. Tissue paper product based on cellulose fibre material is treated with an aqueous or water-free lotion comprising: (a) up to 20 wt. %, preferably 4-10 wt. % of a softener selected from mineral oils, alkyl ethoxylates, fatty acid esters or mixtures of these; (b) up to 5 wt. % of a quaternary ammonium compound of formula (I); and (c) up to 20 wt. % of a polysiloxane. Two or three substitutents R = 1-6 C alkyl or hydroxyalkyl and the remaining substituent(s) R = 14-22 C hydrocarbon group or a biologically decomposable ester group X = a physiologically acceptable anion.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Tissuepapierprodukt auf Basis eines Cellulosefasermaterials und eine zu seiner Herstellung geeignete wasserhaltige oder wasserfreie Lotion beschrieben, die a) bis zu 20 Gewichtsprozent eines Weichmachers ausgewählt aus der Gruppe der Mineralöle, der Alkylethoxylate oder der Fettsäureester oder ihren Mischungen; b) bis zu 5 Gewichtsprozent einer quaternären Ammoniumverbindung der Formel I <IMAGE> in der zwei oder drei der Substituenten R einen C1 bis C6 Alkyl- oder Hydroxyalkylrest und die übrigen Substituenten R einen C14 bis C22-Kohlenwasserstoffrest oder eine biologisch abbaubare Estergruppierung sind und X ein physiologisch verträgliches Anion bedeuten; und c) bis zu 20 Gewichtsprozent eines Polysiloxans enthält. Das mit Hilfe dieser Lotion hergestellte Tissuepapierprodukt ist als Toilettenpapier, Kosmetiktuch, Papiertaschentuch oder als Papierhandtuch hervorragend geeignet.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21H 17/72; A61K 7/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21H 21/22 (2006.01); D21H 17/04 (2006.01); D21H 17/06 (2006.01); D21H 17/07 (2006.01); D21H 17/14 (2006.01); D21H 17/20 (2006.01); D21H 17/53 (2006.01); D21H 17/59 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21H 21/22 (2013.01); D21H 17/04 (2013.01); D21H 17/06 (2013.01); D21H 17/07 (2013.01); D21H 17/14 (2013.01); D21H 17/20 (2013.01); D21H 17/53 (2013.01); D21H 17/59 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19858616 A1 20000621; DE 19858616 B4 20050317; EP 1013823 A1 20000628

INPADOC legal status


2005-05-25 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050331

2003-10-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030905

2001-03-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000627

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI