Global Patent Index - EP 1013828 A1

EP 1013828 A1 2000-06-28 - Machine for distributing and profiling a railroad ballast

Title (en)

Machine for distributing and profiling a railroad ballast

Title (de)

Arbeitsgerät zum Verteilen und Profilieren von Schotter eines Gleissbettes

Title (fr)

Engin de répartition et de profilage du ballast d'une voie ferrée

Publication

EP 1013828 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99121984 A

Priority

DE 29822824 U

Abstract (en)

The vehicle is fitted with standard wheels for road travel and retractable tracked rollers to allow it to be moved along railway tracks. The vehicle (MF) has wheels (11) fitted with standard tyres for road travel and also with a retractable mechanism containing tracked rollers (12) to enable it to travel along railway tracks. A plough (FP, SP, ZP) adjusted by hydraulic pistons (HK1-HK3, HK12) is used to level or shape the ballast. The plough comprises a wedge-shaped adjustable front plough (FP) mounted on the front of the vehicle and assembled from individual segments (20,22,24), side ploughs (SP) on either length side of the vehicle, which are height and width adjustable and tiltable, and an intermediate plough (ZP) between the two wheel axles, which can be lowered into the bed of ballast between the rails in the track in order to bank up the ballast there.

Abstract (de)

Arbeitsgerät zum Verteilen und Profilieren von Schotter eines Gleisbettes bestehend aus einem Mehrwegefahrzeug mit luftbereiften Rädern für die Straßenfahrt und mit einer absenkbaren, mit Spurrollen versehenen Schienenführungseinrichtung (SF) für die Schienenfahrt daran angelenkte und einstellbare, dem zu erstellenden Streckenprofil des Gleisbettes anpassbare, hydraulische Schotterpflüge, welche einen an der Frontseite des Mehrwegefahrzeuges angeordneten, aus Einzelsegmenten bestehenden, als Keilpflug betreibbaren Frontpflug (FP), je einen jeweils den Längsseiten des Mehrwegefahrzeuges zugeordneten höhen-, breiten- sowie neigungsverstellbare seitlichen Schotterpflug (SP), sowie einem zwischen die Schienen des Gleisbettes absenkbaren Zwischenachspflug (ZP) zur Formung der Böschungswinkel des Gleisbettes umfassen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01B 27/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01B 27/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01B 27/02 (2013.01); E01B 2203/083 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29822824 U1 19990225; EP 1013828 A1 20000628

INPADOC legal status


2004-08-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040212

2003-11-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031001

2001-03-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR GB LI SE

2000-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000824

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI SE

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI