Global patent index - EP 1013837 A3

EP 1013837 A3 2001-03-07 - Outlet assembly for a bath tub

Title (en)

Outlet assembly for a bath tub

Title (de)

Ablaufgarnitur für eine Badewanne

Title (fr)

Bonde pour baignoire

Publication

EP 1013837 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99122816 A

Priority

DE 29823021 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1013837A2] The valve cone in the closed position closes an inlet aperture of a valve body inserted in the housing. The valve cone (15) is connected with a threaded socket (25) provided with an inner thread, in which engages a drivable threaded spindle(29). The valve body is formed as a non-rotatable tube piece (17)in the housing (3). DETAIL DESCRIPTION - The tube piece has a central guide bush (24) connected to it by ribs (26). In the guide bush the threaded socket is non-rotatably fitted. The threaded socket is of one-piece construction with the valve cone. The threaded spindle can be fitted onto a vertical drive pin (30), formed as a multi-edge pin and which engages positively in a recess of the threaded spindle.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03C 1/23

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03C 1/23 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03C 1/2304 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29823021 U1 19990218; AT 295917 T 20050615; EP 1013837 A2 20000628; EP 1013837 A3 20010307; EP 1013837 B1 20050518

INPADOC legal status

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151120

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151120

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151120

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151120

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151124

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-03-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2006-05-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060221

2006-03-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-06-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59912066

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-06-23

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2005-05-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: DR.THOMAS STEPHAN MARTIN, WEBER & PARTNER

2005-05-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2004-07-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VIEGA GMBH & CO. KG.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-12-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031021

2001-11-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE FR IT LI

2001-08-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010612

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI