Global Patent Index - EP 1013840 A1

EP 1013840 A1 2000-06-28 - Connector for mixed timber-concrete constructions

Title (en)

Connector for mixed timber-concrete constructions

Title (de)

Verbindungsmittel für Holz-Beton Konstruktionen

Title (fr)

Raccord pour constructions mixtes bois-béton

Publication

EP 1013840 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98124601 A

Priority

EP 98124601 A

Abstract (en)

A connector for mixed timber-concrete constructions, of small or large dimensions, comprising a base or peg (11) housed in a cut (20) made in a wooden beam (1), and an elongated body (12) terminating in a widened head (13), that remains embedded in the concrete (5), the connector having a central though hole (14) passing though it for the passage of a screw or special nail (15), which can also be made in a single body therewith, able to hold the connector in position. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 5/23

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 5/23 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 5/23 (2013.01); E04B 2005/237 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1013840 A1 20000628; EP 1013840 B1 20020327; AT 215159 T 20020415; DE 69804475 D1 20020502

INPADOC legal status


2003-03-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021230

2003-01-03 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2002-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-09-25 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020925

2002-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020628

2002-05-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69804475 20020502

2002-03-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-03-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR LI

2002-03-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020327

2002-03-27 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020327

2002-03-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020327

2002-03-27 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020327

2002-03-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 215159 T 20020415

2001-07-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-03-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE ES FR LI

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000721

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR LI

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI