Global Patent Index - EP 1013841 A1

EP 1013841 A1 2000-06-28 - Dormer window

Title (en)

Dormer window

Title (de)

Dachgaube

Title (fr)

Lucarne

Publication

EP 1013841 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99204360 A

Priority

NL 1010879 A

Abstract (en)

Dormer window (1) having an upper wall (7), a front wall (5) and two side walls (6), the side walls (6) and possibly the front wall (5) as well being provided with gutters (10) at their upper edge area, which gutters extend alongside of it from the front to the rear and to the side, respectively, which in relation to the upper surface of the upper wall (7) have a lowered gutter bottom (9), the upper surface (7) being at fall to the gutter (10). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 7/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 7/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 7/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1013841 A1 20000628; EP 1013841 B1 20050330; DE 69924458 D1 20050504; DE 69924458 T2 20060216; NL 1010879 C2 20000626

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081231

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081217

2009-11-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090701

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090701

2009-10-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090831

2009-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081231

2009-09-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090701

2009-08-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081217

2009-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *UBBINK B.V.

- Effective date: 20081231

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080211

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071213

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20071207

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20071213

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20071227

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-03-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-03-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060102

2005-05-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69924458 P 20050504

2005-03-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL

2005-03-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-03-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: UBBINK B.V.

2003-10-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030827

2001-03-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE FR GB NL

2000-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000807

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI