Global Patent Index - EP 1013844 A1

EP 1013844 A1 2000-06-28 - Water drainage

Title (en)

Water drainage

Title (de)

Wasserablauf

Title (fr)

Ecoulement d'eau

Publication

EP 1013844 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99125681 A

Priority

DE 19860160 A

Abstract (en)

The water drain, for sealed flat surfaces (2), has a container (9) in a sealed fitting over the drain opening (4). It has a top cover (10) and a side wall (11) with entry openings (14) round its periphery which extend down to the flat surface in a lower height than the side wall (11). The container has hermetic sealing over the entry openings.

Abstract (de)

Ein Wasserablauf für versiegelte ebene Flächen (2) mit einem lotrechten Ablaufrohr (3), das mit einer Ablauföffnung (4) in die ebene Fläche (2) mündet und so dimensioniert ist, dass bei einer geringen Anstauhöhe des Wassers auf der ebenen Fläche (2) ein Freispiegelablauf durch das Ablaufrohr (3) stattfindet und bei einer größeren Anstauhöhe durch die Füllung des Ablaufrohres (3) ein Unterdruck durch das abströmende Wasser ausgebildet wird, erlaubt die Abführung einer stark vergrößerten Wassermenge von der ebene Fläche (2) durch einen auf die Ablauföffnung (4) abgedichtet aufgesetzten Behälter (9) mit einer Deckelwandung (10) und einer Seitenwandung (11), in der sich über den Umfang verteilte, bis an die ebene Fläche (2) reichende Einlauföffnungen (14) befinden, deren Höhe kleiner als die Höhe der Seitenwandung (11) ist, wobei der Behälter (9) oberhalb der Einlauföffnungen (14) luftdicht ausgebildet ist, sodass sich beim Erreichen einer Anstauhöhe, die der Höhe der Einlauföffnungen (14) entspricht, im Behälter (9) ein abgeschlossener Luftraum ausbildet, in dem durch den Unterdruck im Ablaufrohr (3) ein Unterdruck entsteht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04D 13/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03F 5/04 (2006.01); E04D 13/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/0409 (2013.01); E04D 2013/0427 (2013.01); E04D 2013/0436 (2013.01); E04D 2013/044 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Citation (third parties)

Third party :

  • FI 70446 B 19860327 - KONTEKLA OY [FI]
  • "Wasserabl{ufers", ANNOUNCEMENT UV SYSTEMS, XX, XX, 1 January 1900 (1900-01-01), XX, pages 1, XP002970910

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE DK FI FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1013844 A1 20000628; EP 1013844 B1 20051123; AT 310865 T 20051215; DE 19860160 A1 20000713; DE 19860160 C2 20010308; DE 59912824 D1 20051229; DK 1013844 T3 20060306

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20161219

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20161219

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20161222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151223

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-12-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-08-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59912824

- Representative's name: GRAMM, LINS & PARTNER PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAEL, DE

2012-07-12 [REG DE R100] EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT UNAMENDED NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 59912824

- Effective date: 20120120

2012-05-23 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20120120

2006-10-04 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: PER SOMMERHEIN AB

- Effective date: 20060822

2006-06-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-03-06 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2006-01-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20051212

2005-12-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59912824 P 20051229

2005-11-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK FI FR GB

2005-11-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-11-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030924

2001-03-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE DK FI FR GB

2001-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001111

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK FI FR GB

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI