Global Patent Index - EP 1013849 A1

EP 1013849 A1 2000-06-28 - Modular scaffold standard

Title (en)

Modular scaffold standard

Title (de)

Modulgerüstrohr

Title (fr)

Montant d'échafaudage modulaire

Publication

EP 1013849 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99125001 A

Priority

DE 19859859 A

Abstract (en)

At least two tubes (2) constitute the module scaffolding tube. To at least one holding device (3) horizontal and/or diagonal scaffolding tubes are fixed. The holding device has at least one sleeve (4) pressed onto the tubes. The tubes are welded to the holding device. They can also be shrunk in or on the holding device.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Modulgerüstrohr (1), das: mindestens zwei Rohre (2) und mindestens eine Haltevorrichtung (3), an denen die horizontalen und/oder diagonalen Gerüstrohre befestigt werden, aufweist, wobei jeweils zwei Rohre (2) durch eine Haltevorrichtung (3) form- und/oder kraftschlüssig miteinander verbunden sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04G 7/20; E04G 7/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04G 7/20 (2006.01); E04G 7/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04G 7/20 (2013.01); E04G 7/306 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1013849 A1 20000628; CA 2292685 A1 20000623; DE 19859859 A1 20000629

INPADOC legal status


2004-11-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040504

2004-03-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031223

2001-03-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001228

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI