Global Patent Index - EP 1013850 A1

EP 1013850 A1 2000-06-28 - Scaffold standard with depressions for elevating its load bearing capacity

Title (en)

Scaffold standard with depressions for elevating its load bearing capacity

Title (de)

Gerüstrohr mit Eindrückungen zur Erhöhung der Lastaufnahmefähigkeit

Title (fr)

Montant d'échafaudage avec renfoncements pour élever sa capacité de reprise de charge

Publication

EP 1013850 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99124509 A

Priority

DE 19859365 A

Abstract (en)

A holding device (2) is fitted to a tube (8) of a vertical scaffolding tube (1) arrangement and in it can be suspended horizontal and/or diagonal scaffolding tubes. The tube (8) in the area in which the holding device is fitted has a press-in arrangement (3) extending over at least a part segment of the tube periphery. The tube (8) can have at least one press-in arrangement beneath and one above the holding device. The press-in arrangement is 3-5 mm deep and preferably 8-40 mm wide.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein vertikales Gerüstrohr (1) mit einem Rohr (8), an dem mindestens eine Haltevorrichtung (2) angebracht ist, in die horizontale und/oder diagonale Gerüstrohre einhängbar sind, wobei das Rohr (8) in dem Bereich, in dem die Haltevorrichtung (2) an dem vertikalen Gerüstrohr (8) angebracht ist, jeweils mindestens eine sich mindestens über ein Teilsegment des Umfanges des Gerüstrohres (8) erstreckende Eindrückung (3,5) aufweist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04G 7/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04G 7/30 (2006.01); E04G 7/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04G 7/306 (2013.01); E04G 7/307 (2013.01); E04G 7/32 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1013850 A1 20000628; CA 2292206 A1 20000622; DE 19859365 A1 20000629

INPADOC legal status


2004-11-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040504

2004-03-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031223

2001-03-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001228

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI