Global patent index - EP 1013859 A3

EP 1013859 A3 2001-03-07 - Device for keyless locking and unlocking of motor vehicle doors

Title (en)

Device for keyless locking and unlocking of motor vehicle doors

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum schlüssellosen Ver- und Entriegeln von Kraftfahrzeugtüren

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour le vérrouillage et le dévérrouillage sans clé des portes d'une automobile

Publication

EP 1013859 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99121640 A

Priority

DE 19859232 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1013859A2] Described is a device for keyless locking and unlocking of motor vehicle doors, comprising a remote control with a transmitter, a control element located in the motor vehicle, said control element controlling the respective locking mechanism of the door, and a receiving aerial associated with the control element. In order to create such a device with a powerful receiving aerial for ultra high frequency signals, it is proposed that the receiving aerial (5) be arranged in at least one of the control stalks (6, 7) of the motor vehicle. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 49/00; B60R 16/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07C 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07C 9/00182 (2013.01); G07C 2009/00793 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1013859 A2 20000628; EP 1013859 A3 20010307; DE 19859232 A1 20000706; DE 19859232 C2 20001012

INPADOC legal status

2002-08-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-07-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010908

2001-11-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7E 05B 49/00 A, 7B 60R 16/00 B

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI