Global Patent Index - EP 1013860 A1

EP 1013860 A1 2000-06-28 - Locking device for a vehicles having a plurality of doors

Title (en)

Locking device for a vehicles having a plurality of doors

Title (de)

Schliesseinrichtung für ein mehrere Türen aufweisendes Kraftfahrzeug

Title (fr)

Dispositif de verrouillage pour une véhicule automobile comprenant plusieurs portes

Publication

EP 1013860 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99123263 A

Priority

DE 19857176 A

Abstract (en)

The arrangement has a portable transmitter (21) and a receiver mounted on the vehicle for a code from the transmitter and a controller (20) for driving the door locks (24,25). The controller has an arrangement for determining the position of the transmitter and for exclusive drive of at least one lock depending on the position of the transmitter.

Abstract (de)

Eine Schließeinrichtung für einen Reisebus (13) hat eine Steuereinrichtung (20) zur Erfassung einer Position eines tragbaren Senders (21). Die Steuereinrichtung (20) steuert in Abhängigkeit von der Position des Senders (21) ausschließlich für diese Position vorgesehene Türen (22, 23) des Reisebusses (13) verriegelnde Schlösser (24, 25) an. Hierdurch müssen nicht benötigte Türen (22, 23) nicht überwacht werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 49/00; E05B 65/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60R 25/00 (2006.01); E05B 49/00 (2006.01); E05B 49/04 (2006.01); G07C 9/00 (2006.01); H04Q 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07C 9/00309 (2013.01); G07C 2009/00396 (2013.01); G07C 2009/00523 (2013.01); G07C 2009/00793 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19857176 A1 20000615; EP 1013860 A1 20000628; JP 2000179206 A 20000627; US 6563416 B1 20030513

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-15 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20051021

2003-10-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030911

2002-01-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-03-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB SE

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001220

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI