Global Patent Index - EP 1013861 A1

EP 1013861 A1 2000-06-28 - Double wing assembly without intermediate jamb for door, french-window or similar

Title (en)

Double wing assembly without intermediate jamb for door, french-window or similar

Title (de)

Doppelflügeleinheit ohne Mittelpfosten für Tür, Fenstertür oder dergleichen

Title (fr)

Ensemble de deux vantaux sans meneau central pour porte, porte-fenêtre ou analogue

Publication

EP 1013861 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99402983 A

Priority

FR 9816259 A

Abstract (en)

The outer edges of the two leaves (2,3) of the door abut together when the door is closed. A horizontally-moving bolt with a sloping face (30) on the first door engages in a striker plate (21) in the second door. There is a handle in each door which moves vertical rods (15,19) in each adjacent door edge, to engage the top of the door frame and sockets in the floor, to hold the two leaves of the door closed, and the handle in the second door operates the horizontally-moving bolt.

Abstract (fr)

Le vantail de service (2) est équipé d'une crémone-serrure bidirectionnelle (14) dont chaque tringle (15) est logée dans le premier canal (10) et dont la têtière (16) est logée dans le second canal (12) de la rainure (8) du chant avant (4), et qui comporte au moins un pêne (17). Le vantail secondaire (3) est équipé d'une crémone bidirectionnelle (18) dont chaque tringle (19) est logée dans le premier canal (11) et dont la têtière (20) est logée dans le second canal (13) de la rainure (9) du chant avant (5) et comporte une gâche (21) fixée en applique sur la têtière (20) et agencée de manière telle qu'elle ne gêne pas la position de fermeture à chants sensiblement jointifs des deux vantaux (2, 3). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05C 7/04; E05C 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05C 7/04 (2006.01); E05C 9/00 (2006.01); E05B 63/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05C 7/04 (2013.01); E05C 9/004 (2013.01); E05C 9/1808 (2013.01); E05B 63/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1013861 A1 20000628; EP 1013861 B1 20030827; DE 69910722 D1 20031002; DE 69910722 T2 20040617; ES 2205738 T3 20040501; FR 2787500 A1 20000623; FR 2787500 B1 20010504

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071130

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071130

2008-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071130

2008-11-14 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20080930

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080603

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051130

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-07-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20071130

2008-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061201

2008-02-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20061201

2006-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061130

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-11-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061127

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-11-24 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061124

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-11-24 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061124

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-12-19 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051219

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-08-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040528

2004-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2205738

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-10-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69910722

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-10-02

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-09-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

2003-08-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-08-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-03-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000620

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI