Global Patent Index - EP 1013862 A1

EP 1013862 A1 2000-06-28 - Espagnolette type locking device

Title (en)

Espagnolette type locking device

Title (de)

Verriegelungsbeschlag mit Treibstangen

Title (fr)

Ferrure de verrouillage du type cremone

Publication

EP 1013862 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99440353 A

Priority

FR 9816401 A

Abstract (en)

The elongated box contains a rack-and-pinion drive mechanism (3) with a partially-toothed pinion (4). It engages with a rack (15) which has teeth on both sides. The first set of teeth (21) engage the pinion and the second set of teeth (20) engage with teeth in a joggled central section of a two-ended bolt. The pinion is accommodated in an auxiliary box (13) which fits into a recess (14) in the main elongated box (2).

Abstract (fr)

L'invention a trait à une ferrure de verrouillage du type crémone comprenant un boîtier (2) pour le logement d'un mécanisme d'entraînement (3) comportant un fouillot (4) venant s'engréner sur une crémaillère associée à une tringle de manoeuvre (7) s'étendant au-dessus et/ou en-dessous de ce boîtier (2). Selon l'invention, ce boîtier (2) est défini par un boîtier principal (12) et un boîtier auxiliaire (13), ledit fouillot (4) étant monté en rotation dans ce dernier lequel est prévu apte à prendre position dans une réservation (14) adaptée dans le boîtier principal (12) de manière à amener en coopération la denture du fouillot (4) avec ladite crémaillère (6) soit directement, soit au travers d'une pièce d'entraînement intermédiaire (15), selon la cote (16 ; 16A) de fouillot (4) à respecter. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05C 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/02 (2006.01); E05C 9/04 (2006.01); E05B 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/021 (2013.01); E05C 9/041 (2013.01); E05B 9/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1013862 A1 20000628; FR 2787493 A1 20000623; FR 2787493 B1 20010209

INPADOC legal status


2007-11-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070605

2003-10-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030909

2001-03-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000908

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI