Global patent index - EP 1013866 A2

EP 1013866 A2 2000-06-28 - Device for connecting a vehicle window pane to a window regulator

Title (en)

Device for connecting a vehicle window pane to a window regulator

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Verbinden einer Kraftfahrzeug-Fensterscheibe mit einem Fensterheber

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour la liaison d'une vitre de véhicule avec un lève-vitre

Publication

EP 1013866 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99250426 A

Priority

DE 19860745 A

Abstract (en)

A road vehicle window pane connected to an accommodation is connected to a window raiser by a device involving at least one driver (2) connected to guide and transport devices of the window raiser. The driver is connectable to the pane accommodation by positively interengaged components (21,41,42,28,38), which are separated from each other in pairs, and on connection of the window pane with the raiser, come into engagement one after the other. A first pair of positive engagement components (21,31) bring together and/or align the driver and the pane accommodation (3), and a second pair of such components (41,42) locks the connection of the driver and the pane accommodation.

Abstract (de)

Bei einer Vorrichtung zum Verbinden einer mit einer Scheibenaufnahme 3 verbundenen Kraftfahrzeug-Fensterscheibe mit einem Fensterheber, der einen mit den Führungs- und Transportmitteln des Fensterhebers verbundenen Mitnehmer 2 aufweist, sind der Mitnehmer 2 und die Scheibenaufnahme 3 über jeweils mindestens zwei räumlich voneinander getrennte, in unterschiedlicher Richtung formschlüssig und bei der Montage nacheinander ineinandergreifende Formschlußelemente 21, 31; 22, 32; 35, 36, 41, 42; 28, 38 miteinander verbunden. dabei sind erste Formschlußelemente 21, 31 in Montagerichtung der Fensterscheibe formschlüssig miteinander verbindbar und zweite Formschlußelemente 22, 32, 35, 36, 41, 42 in einer im wesentlichen senkrecht zur Montagerichtung der Fensterscheibe verlaufenden Ebene entgegengesetzt zueinander ausgerichtet und werden nach der Verbindung der ersten Formschlußelemente 21, 31 durch eine Schwenkbewegung der Fensterscheibe in Eingriff miteinander gebracht. Dritte Formschlußelemente 28, 38 dienen der zusätzlichen mechanischen Sicherung der Verbindung von Mitnehmer 2 und Scheibenaufnahme 3 und sind bei teilweise oder vollständig geöffneter Fensterscheibe miteinander in Eingriff. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05F 11/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05F 11/38 (2006.01); E05F 11/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05F 11/385 (2013.01); E05Y 2600/524 (2013.01); E05Y 2600/53 (2013.01); E05Y 2600/60 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/55 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

JP H06135228 A 19940517 - HONDA MOTOR CO LTD

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1013866 A2 20000628; EP 1013866 A3 20000809; DE 19860745 A1 20000706; DE 19860745 B4 20040902

INPADOC legal status

2008-11-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20080603

2001-04-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT SE

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010207

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI