Global Patent Index - EP 1013866 A3

EP 1013866 A3 2000-08-09 - Device for connecting a vehicle window pane to a window regulator

Title (en)

Device for connecting a vehicle window pane to a window regulator

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Verbinden einer Kraftfahrzeug-Fensterscheibe mit einem Fensterheber

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour la liaison d'une vitre de véhicule avec un lève-vitre

Publication

EP 1013866 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99250426 A

Priority

DE 19860745 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1013866A2] A road vehicle window pane connected to an accommodation is connected to a window raiser by a device involving at least one driver (2) connected to guide and transport devices of the window raiser. The driver is connectable to the pane accommodation by positively interengaged components (21,41,42,28,38), which are separated from each other in pairs, and on connection of the window pane with the raiser, come into engagement one after the other. A first pair of positive engagement components (21,31) bring together and/or align the driver and the pane accommodation (3), and a second pair of such components (41,42) locks the connection of the driver and the pane accommodation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05F 11/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05F 11/38 (2006.01); E05F 11/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05F 11/385 (2013.01); E05Y 2600/524 (2013.01); E05Y 2600/53 (2013.01); E05Y 2600/60 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/55 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[XA] EP 0294254 A1 19881207 - SAINT GOBAIN VITRAGE [FR]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1013866 A2 20000628; EP 1013866 A3 20000809; DE 19860745 A1 20000706; DE 19860745 B4 20040902

INPADOC legal status


2008-11-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080603

2001-04-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT SE

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010207

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI