Global Patent Index - EP 1013868 A1

EP 1013868 A1 2000-06-28 - Closure section member with a double abutment and closure device made with such members

Title (en)

Closure section member with a double abutment and closure device made with such members

Title (de)

Verschliessvorrichtungsprofil mit doppeltem Anschlag und mit diesen Profilen hergestellte Verschliessvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Profilé pour dispositif de fermeture à double frappe et dispositif de fermeture constitué par un tel profilé

Publication

EP 1013868 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99440373 A

Priority

FR 9816603 A

Abstract (en)

The contact zones are offset relative to one another and positioned symmetrically on either side of the median plane (PM) of the extrusions lying parallel to their outer faces (3, 3'). Door or window frame, made from extrusions (1) with inner partitions and cavities for reinforcing members, has two contact zones (2', 2) between facing surfaces, one of which is shaped to receive a seal (4').

Abstract (fr)

La présente invention a pour objet un profilé (1) pour dispositif de fermeture à double frappe, notamment pour portes et fenêtres, comprenant une partie de contact (2) destinée à coopérer avec un profilé complémentaire présentant une partie de contact identique ou non, cette partie de contact du profilé comportant deux zones de contact ou de frappe (2' et 2") situées entre les faces latérales opposées externes (3 et 3') dudit profilé (1), dont l'une est pourvue d'un moyen de fixation d'un joint. Profilé caractérisé en ce que lesdites zones de contact ou de frappe (2' et 2") sont décalées l'une par rapport à l'autre et disposées sensiblement symétriquement de part et d'autre du plan médian (PM) dudit profilé (1) parallèle auxdites faces latérales (3, 3'), lesdites zones (2', 2") présentant une disposition relative telle que la surface de contact à l'état comprimé dudit joint (4') fixé au niveau de l'une (2') des zones (2', 2"), est symétrique à la surface de l'autre zone (2") par rapport au plan médian (PM). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/08 (2006.01); E06B 3/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/362 (2013.01); E06B 3/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1013868 A1 20000628; FR 2787824 A1 20000630; FR 2787824 B1 20010223

INPADOC legal status


2003-04-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021005

2001-05-02 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: TRYBA (SOCIETE PAR ACTIONS SIMPLIFIEE)

2001-03-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010124

2001-03-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001121

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI