Global Patent Index - EP 1013873 A2

EP 1013873 A2 2000-06-28 - Safety device against light and/or weather and/or burglary

Title (en)

Safety device against light and/or weather and/or burglary

Title (de)

Einrichtung zum Schutz gegen Licht und/oder Witterung und/oder Einbruch

Title (fr)

Dispositif de protection contre lumière et/ou intempéries et/ou intrusion

Publication

EP 1013873 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99811007 A

Priority

CH 254198 A

Abstract (en)

The device (13) comprises a curtain, roller blind, drop blind, push blind or awning and protects against light and/or the effect of weather and/or break-in. It incorporates at least one elongated sensor component (31), with which monitoring devices (35) are connected, in order to report an interruption of the sensor component. Each sensor component has an electrical conductor or a light conductor or a free hollow space. The monitoring devices are so formed that with an interruption of the sensor component they produce at least one alarm signal.

Abstract (de)

Die Einrichtung besitzt ein zum Beispiel aus einem Raffstore (13) bestehendes Schutzorgan mit einem ersten Ende (14) sowie einem zweiten Ende (15). Das letztere ist durch eine Stellvorrichtung (55) verschiebbar, so dass das Schutzorgan wahlweise in eine Abdeck-Stellung oder in eine Freigabe-Stellung bringbar ist. Das Schutzorgan (13) ist mit mindestens einem vom ersten Ende (14) zum zweiten Ende (15) verlaufenden, zum Beispiel einen elektrischen Leiter aufweisenden Sensorelement (31) versehen. Das bzw. jedes Sensorelement (31) ist mit Überwachungsmitteln (35) verbunden, die beim Unterbruch des bzw. mindestens eines Sensorelements (31) mindestens ein Alarmsignal erzeugen. Dadurch wird die Schutzwirkung des Schutzorgans gegen einen Einbruch beträchtlich erhöht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 9/86

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/06 (2006.01); E06B 9/327 (2006.01); E06B 9/86 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/86 (2013.01); E06B 9/327 (2013.01); E06B 9/0638 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1013873 A2 20000628; EP 1013873 A3 20000726; EP 1013873 B1 20050727; AT 300658 T 20050815; DE 59912322 D1 20050901

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091103

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100601

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091103

2010-06-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081126

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-02-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20081112

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20081117

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081107

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-07-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060428

2005-10-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BRAUNPAT BRAUN EDER AG

2005-09-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59912322 P 20050901

2005-07-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-07-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE IT LI

2003-03-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030121

2001-04-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE IT LI

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001102

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE IT LI

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI