Global Patent Index - EP 1013874 A2

EP 1013874 A2 2000-06-28 - Device and method for the replacement of tubes

Title (en)

Device and method for the replacement of tubes

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Ersetzen von Rohren

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé pour le remplacement des tuyaux

Publication

EP 1013874 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99125536 A

Priority

DE 19859928 A

Abstract (en)

To renew a pipe conduit laid underground (4), a protective pipe (5) is installed before the old pipe section is removed. The protective pipe has an inner cross-section greater than the outer cross-section of the old pipe section. The protective pipe at its front side has an advance drive head (6) with an inner and/or outer front section (7). The advance drive head at a position behind the front end has an inwardly extending cutting edge for destruction of the old pipe section (3). The protective pipe is connected with a flushing ring which has inwardy directed flushing apertures.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Verfahren zum Erneuern einer im Erdreich (4) verlegten Rohrleitung beschrieben. Bei diesem Verfahren wird die Rohrleitung in einer Startgrube (1) und in einer Zielgrube (2) getrennt, ein zwischen den beiden Gruben (1,2) befindlicher alter Rohrabschnitt (3) ohne Bildung eines Grabens aus dem umgebenden Erdreich (4) entfernt und in den dadurch entstehenden Kanal ein neuer Rohrabschnitt eingebracht. Erfindungsgemäß wird vor der Entfernung des alten Rohrabschnitts (3) ein Schutzrohr (5) mit einem Innenquerschnitt, der größer als der Außenquerschnitt des alten Rohrabschnitts (3) ist, von der Startgrube (1) aus auf den alten Rohrabschnitt (3) aufgefahren und dann auf diesem im wesentlichen bis zur Zielgrube (2) vorgetrieben. Außerdem bezieht sich die Erfindung auf ein Schutzrohr (5) zur Durchführung des erfindungsgemäßen Verfahrens. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 7/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 7/20 (2006.01); E21B 29/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 29/10 (2013.01); E21B 7/20 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1013874 A2 20000628; EP 1013874 A3 20001227; DE 19859928 C1 20000831; PL 337421 A1 20000703

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030701

2001-09-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010602

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 21B 7/20 A, 7E 21B 7/26 B

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI