Global Patent Index - EP 1013874 A3

EP 1013874 A3 2000-12-27 - Device and method for the replacement of tubes

Title (en)

Device and method for the replacement of tubes

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Ersetzen von Rohren

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé pour le remplacement des tuyaux

Publication

EP 1013874 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99125536 A

Priority

DE 19859928 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1013874A2] To renew a pipe conduit laid underground (4), a protective pipe (5) is installed before the old pipe section is removed. The protective pipe has an inner cross-section greater than the outer cross-section of the old pipe section. The protective pipe at its front side has an advance drive head (6) with an inner and/or outer front section (7). The advance drive head at a position behind the front end has an inwardly extending cutting edge for destruction of the old pipe section (3). The protective pipe is connected with a flushing ring which has inwardy directed flushing apertures.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 7/20; E21B 7/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 7/20 (2006.01); E21B 29/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 29/10 (2013.01); E21B 7/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] US 5096000 A 19920317 - HESSE ALFONS [DE]
  • [XY] DE 3938765 A1 19910529 - BILFINGER BERGER BAU [DE]
  • [X] DE 19522579 C1 19960725 - BERLINER WASSER BETRIEBE [DE]
  • [Y] US 5173009 A 19921222 - MORIARTY MARTIN [IE]
  • [PX] DE 29822944 U1 19990930 - LUDWIG PFEIFFER HOCH UND TIEFB [DE]
  • [X] GAEBELEIN W: "NEUENTWICKLUNG IN DER GRABENLOSEN AUSWECHSLUNG VON TRINKWASSER- HAUSANSCHLUSSLEITUNGEN AUS STAHL UND BLEI NEW DEVELOPMENTS IN NON-DIGGING REPLACEMENT OF STEEL AND LEAD DOMESTIC DRINKING WATER SERVICE PIPING", 3R INTERNATIONAL,DE,VULKAN-VERLAG, ESSEN, vol. 35, no. 1, 1996, pages 39 - 44, XP000641691, ISSN: 0340-3386

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1013874 A2 20000628; EP 1013874 A3 20001227; DE 19859928 C1 20000831; PL 337421 A1 20000703

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030701

2001-09-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010602

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 21B 7/20 A, 7E 21B 7/26 B

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI