Global patent index - EP 1013890 A2

EP 1013890 A2 2000-06-28 - Abradable seal for turbomachines

Title (en)

Abradable seal for turbomachines

Title (de)

Anstreifdichtung für Turbomaschinen

Title (fr)

Joint abradable pour turbomachines

Publication

EP 1013890 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99124032 A

Priority

DE 19858031 A

Abstract (en)

The contact seal consists entirely of a foamed metallic corrosion-resistant high-temperature alloy, fixed to the wall sector by high temperature soldering. Since there is no open-pore structure, the solder is not taken into the seal structure by capillary attraction, so the foam is easy to solder. The unfoamed raw material may first be connected to the wall sector, and then foamed.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Anstreifdichtung zwischen einem Wandabschnitt und den Schaufelspitzen einer Gasturbine, die vollständig aus einer aufgeschäumten, metallischen, korrosionsbeständigen Hochtemperaturlegierung besteht. Nach einem ersten Herstellverfahren werden vorgefertigte Metallschaumsegmente durch Hochtemperaturlöten mit den Wandabschnitten verbunden. Alternativ kann das nicht aufgeschäumte Vormaterial der Ansteifdichtung zunächst mit den Wandabschnitten verbunden und anschließend daran aufgeschäumt werden. Solche Metallschaumdichtungen besitzen ein optimales Dichtverhalten, bei gleichzeitiger Verbesserung der Isolierung der Gehäuestruktur gegen das Heißgas. Durch Einflußnahme auf die Aufschäumparameter ist die Zellstruktur der Anstreifdichtung in bestimmten Grenzen beeinflußbar, so daß die Einlaufeigenschaften, die Umströmungsbehinderung und die Isolierwirkung auf diese Weise bestimmt werden können.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01D 11/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 11/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 11/127 (2013.01); F05D 2300/612 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19858031 A1 20000621; AT 259027 T 20040215; EP 1013890 A2 20000628; EP 1013890 A3 20011107; EP 1013890 B1 20040204

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160701

2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151209

2016-09-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20160831

2016-08-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20151209

2016-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59908461

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141230

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-02-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141217

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141229

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-05-23 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ROLLS-ROYCE DEUTSCHLAND LTD & CO KG, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59908461

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130402

2012-02-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59908461

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: ,

2012-02-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59908461

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2005-12-09 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051209

2005-01-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20041105

2004-11-09 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041109

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-10-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-03-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59908461

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-03-11

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-02-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040204

2004-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB

2004-02-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-09-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SCHREIBER, KARL

2003-09-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: PLATH, ARMIN, DR.

2002-07-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE FR GB

2002-04-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020306

2002-02-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20011224

2001-11-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ROLLS-ROYCE DEUTSCHLAND LTD & CO KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI