Global Patent Index - EP 1013894 A2

EP 1013894 A2 2000-06-28 - Fan case liner

Title (en)

Fan case liner

Title (de)

Bläsergehäuseauskleidung

Title (fr)

Revêtement pour la virole d'une soufflante

Publication

EP 1013894 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99310555 A

Priority

US 22054498 A

Abstract (en)

A fan case 48 in a gas turbine engine has a radial zone of interaction 60 bounded outwardly by a fan case surface 53. Hardened structure 42 such as overlapping shingles is disposed in the zone 60. The zone 60 is less than one hundredth of the fan case diameter as measured from the blade tips 38 in a non-operative, zero speed engine condition and is such that during a high rotor imbalance condition, the blade tips 38 skid on the hardened structure 42 and reduce the destructive cutting away of the fan case, and reduce torque and imbalance loads transmitted to the interface of the engine and the aircraft. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01D 21/04; F01D 11/12; F01D 25/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02C 7/00 (2006.01); F01D 11/12 (2006.01); F01D 21/04 (2006.01); F01D 25/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 21/04 (2013.01); F01D 11/12 (2013.01); F01D 25/24 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1013894 A2 20000628; EP 1013894 A3 20020109; EP 1013894 B1 20030604; DE 69908540 D1 20030710; DE 69908540 T2 20031218; JP 2000220472 A 20000808

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131223

2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140701

2014-10-16 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69908540

- Effective date: 20140701

2014-08-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131223

2014-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69908540

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121219

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20121219

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-09-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100831

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081205

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-09-22 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2004-04-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69908540 P 20030710

2003-07-09 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-06-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-12-11 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: GAS TURBINE ENGINE

2002-09-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2002-06-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020510

2002-04-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020131

2002-01-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI