Global patent index - EP 1013898 A3

EP 1013898 A3 2000-10-04 - Valve operating system in internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Valve operating system in internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Ventilsteuerungseinrichtung für eine Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif de commande de soupape pour moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 1013898 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99125230 A

Priority

  • JP 36438098 A
  • JP 37634598 A
  • JP 35180099 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1013898A2] A valve operating system in an internal combustion engine includes a cam shaft provided with a valve operating cam, a rocker arm having a pair of support wall portions which are integrally connected at their base ends to a swinging support portion swingably supported on a support member mounted on a cylinder head and which are opposed to each other at a distance in a direction along the swinging axis of the swinging support portion, a support shaft supported between the support wall portions, and a roller which is rotatably supported on the support shaft with a bearing interposed therebetween so as to be in rolling contact with the valve operating cam. A lower connecting wall interconnecting lower portions of the base ends of the support wall portions is projectingly provided on the swinging support portion in a manner opposed to an outer peripheral surface of a lower portion of the roller. Thus, it is possible to increase the rigidity of the rocker arm, while avoiding an increase in size of the rocker arm. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 1/26; F01L 1/053; F01L 1/18; F01L 1/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/053 (2006.01); F01L 1/18 (2006.01); F01L 1/26 (2006.01); F01L 1/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 1/053 (2013.01); F01L 1/185 (2013.01); F01L 1/267 (2013.01); F01L 1/46 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1013898 A2 20000628; EP 1013898 A3 20001004; EP 1013898 B1 20050803; CA 2293000 A1 20000622; CA 2293000 C 20050802; DE 69926475 D1 20050908; DE 69926475 T2 20060406

INPADOC legal status

2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140701

2014-09-25 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69926475

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140701

2014-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69926475

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121213

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-10-11 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R084

- Ref Document Number: 69926475

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120813

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091217

2010-08-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20091217

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081217

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-07-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060504

2005-09-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69926475

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-09-08

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-08-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2005-08-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-08-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030624

2001-06-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE GB

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001121

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI