Global Patent Index - EP 1013918 A3

EP 1013918 A3 2000-10-18 - Intake manifold

Title (en)

Intake manifold

Title (de)

Einlasskrummer

Title (fr)

Collecteur d'admission

Publication

EP 1013918 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99310372 A

Priority

JP 37688498 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1013918A2] An intake manifold has a plurality of branch tubes each joined by brazing in a furnace at one end to a flange on the engine side and at the other end to a surge tank on the throttle chamber side. The surge tank is separated into two pieces or a brazing side member and a non-heating side member. Branch tubes are fixed in position relative to the brazing side member by peen locking with a peening tool or the like and are then joined to the brazing side member by brazing in the furnace. The non-heating side member is not subjected to the brazing in the furnace but is joined to the brazing side member by bolts or the like. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 35/104; F02M 35/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 35/10 (2006.01); F02M 35/104 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 35/112 (2013.01); F02M 35/10078 (2013.01); F02M 35/10144 (2013.01); F02M 35/10327 (2013.01); F02M 35/1036 (2013.01); F05C 2225/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1013918 A2 20000628; EP 1013918 A3 20001018; EP 1013918 B1 20040317; DE 69915573 D1 20040422; DE 69915573 T2 20041230; JP 2000192866 A 20000711; JP 3395060 B2 20030407; KR 100524206 B1 20051026; KR 20000048348 A 20000725; MX PA99011566 A 20040810; TW 491928 B 20020621

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-11 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151110

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151215

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151216

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-10 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-01-23 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 746

- Effective date: 20071227

2005-03-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20041220

2004-12-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-04-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69915573

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-04-22

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-03-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2001-07-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010108

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 02M 35/104 A, 7F 02M 35/10 B

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI