Global Patent Index - EP 1013919 A2

EP 1013919 A2 2000-06-28 - Fuel injection valve

Title (en)

Fuel injection valve

Title (de)

Kraftstoffeinspritzventil

Title (fr)

Soupape d'injection de combustible

Publication

EP 1013919 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99124112 A

Priority

DE 19859537 A

Abstract (en)

The fuel injection valve has a switching valve with a valve seat (51) and valve ball (50) that is raised from the seat in the open state and supplied by a pressure chamber (15) connected to a central high pressure line via a choke bore (17). The transition from the choke inlet to the valve seat form a diffuser. The diffuser can be conical, stepped or a combination of the two.

Abstract (de)

Kraftstoffeinspritzventil für eine Hochdruckeinspritzung von Kraftstoff aus einer zentralen Hochdruckleitung in Brennräume einer Verbrennungskraftmaschine, das ein Schaltventil mit einem Ventilsitz (51) und einer Ventilkugel (50) umfasst, wobei die Ventilkugel (50) in geöffnetem Zustand mittels eines Hochdruckstrahls, der von einem mit einer zentralen Hochdruckleitung in Wirkverbindung stehenden Druckraum (20) aus einer Drosselbohrung (15) gespeist ist, vom Ventilsitz (51) abgehoben ist. Der Übergang von der Drosselbohrung (15) zum Ventilsitz (51) ist als Diffusor ausgebildet. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 47/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 47/00 (2006.01); F02M 47/02 (2006.01); F02M 51/00 (2006.01); F02M 59/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 47/027 (2013.01); F02M 63/0017 (2013.01); F02M 2200/04 (2013.01); F02M 2200/28 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1013919 A2 20000628; EP 1013919 A3 20020213; EP 1013919 B1 20041020; DE 19859537 A1 20000706; JP 2000186647 A 20000704; US 6276335 B1 20010821

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170224

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161220

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-12-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2005-10-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050721

2005-09-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-05-18 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-02-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050131

2004-11-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59910896 P 20041125

2004-11-17 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-10-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-10-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-03-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030210

2002-10-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2002-10-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020813

2002-02-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-02-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-02-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 02M 47/02 A, 7F 02M 59/46 B

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI