Global Patent Index - EP 1013928 A2

EP 1013928 A2 2000-06-28 - Swash plate axial piston pump with pulsation damping means

Title (en)

Swash plate axial piston pump with pulsation damping means

Title (de)

Schrägscheiben-Axialkolbenpumpe mit Einrichtung zur Pulsationsminderung

Title (fr)

Pompe à pistons axiaux à plateau en biais avec disposif d'amortissement de pulsation

Publication

EP 1013928 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99124966 A

Priority

DE 19859328 A

Abstract (en)

At least two passages(24) with associated outlet holes(27) are formed in a connecting plate(17) and also in the web(26) in the cam plate dividing the LP kidney slot from the HP kidney slot and connect a reversing capacity(23) to the piston bores(11) passing through the web. The outlet holes of the passages corresponding to the piston bores are located on the reference circle formed by the LP(19) and the HP(18) kidney slots. The outlet holes and the passages may have the same or different diameters.

Abstract (de)

Bei einer Axialkolbenpumpe in Schrägscheibenbauweise mit in der sich drehenden Zylindertrommel linear beweglichen Kolben und mit einer zur Vermeidung einer Druckpulsation in der Anschlußplatte eingerichteten Umsteuerkapazität soll die Druckpulsation weiter vermindert werden. Hierzu ist vorgesehen, daß in der Anschlußplatte (17) sowie in dem in der Steuerscheibe (20) ausgebildeten Steg (26) zur Verbindung der Umsteuerkapazität (23) mit den über den Steg (26) hinweggehenden Kolbenbohrungen (11) wenigstens zwei Kanäle (24) mit zugehörigen Austrittslöchern (27) ausgebildet sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 1/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04B 1/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 1/2042 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1013928 A2 20000628; EP 1013928 A3 20001108; US 6361285 B1 20020326

INPADOC legal status


2002-03-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010509

2001-08-30 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-07-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 04B 1/20 A, 7F 04B 11/00 B

2000-07-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PARKER HANNIFIN GMBH

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI