Global Patent Index - EP 1013935 B1

EP 1013935 B1 2002-11-13 - Horizontal selfpriming pump with axial inlet

Title (en)

Horizontal selfpriming pump with axial inlet

Title (de)

Waagerechte selbstansaugende Pumpe mit axialem Einlass

Title (fr)

Pompe horizontale autoamorçante à orifice axial

Publication

EP 1013935 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 99403237 A

Priority

FR 9816149 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1013935A1] The pump comprises a housing assembly (21) within which is mounted the pump rotor (2). An axial inlet (22) is located at the end of the pump unit leading to the compression chamber. A flange disk separates the compression chamber and the inlet. The upper section of the flange has an orifice such that the pump can be self-primed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 9/008 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1013935 A1 20000628; EP 1013935 B1 20021113; DE 69903904 D1 20021219; DE 69903904 T2 20030821; FR 2787525 A1 20000623; FR 2787525 B1 20020524

INPADOC legal status


2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141221

2015-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141231

2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141221

2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150701

2015-09-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150831

2015-08-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20141221

2015-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69903904

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20131204

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20131211

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131218

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20131218

- Year of fee payment: 15

2003-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-04-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030325

2002-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69903904 20021219

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-11-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-03-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010205

2001-03-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001211

2000-07-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BERTHELOT, OLIVIER

2000-07-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LEMANCEL, JEROME

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI