Global Patent Index - EP 1013938 A1

EP 1013938 A1 2000-06-28 - Low specific speed blower rotor

Title (en)

Low specific speed blower rotor

Title (de)

Gebläserad mit geringer spezifischer Drehzahl

Title (fr)

Rotor de soufflante radiale à vitesse spécifique réduite

Publication

EP 1013938 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98124090 A

Priority

EP 98124090 A

Abstract (en)

The cross section of the impeller blade passage in its last third is smaller in the direction of the circumferential edge or remains constant and in which the thickness of the impeller blade(6) is correspondingly profiled. The blade incidence has a value of more than 40 degrees. The impeller has an overall weight, including the motor, of less than 10 grams with a power capacity of 0.054 Watts. An Independent claim is included for a use for the radial fan equipped with the proposed impeller and which may be for dust collecting and measuring, and breathing air filtration, or in medical fields for breathing equipment and/or ventilated hoods.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Laufrad (4) für Radialgebläse, umfassend eine Deckscheibe, eine zentrische Bohrung (8) zur Befestigung an einer Antriebswelle, eine Vielzahl teilspiralförmig von außen zur Bohrung verlaufender Laufradschaufeln (6). Radialgebläse mit derartigen Laufrädern weisen für bestimmte Anwendungszwecke eine unzureichende Leistung auf. Darüber hinaus sind sie nicht netzunabhängig und zudem noch überdimensioniert. Ein Hochdrucklaufrad für kleine Volumenströme mit deutlich gesteigertem Wirkungsgrad, das in einem miniaturisierten, netzunabhängigen Radialgebläse eingebaut ist, wäre äußerst wünschenswert. Letzteres wird dadurch erreicht, daß der Querschnitt Ak des Laufradschaufelkanals in seinem letzten Drittel zur Umfangskante hin kleiner wird oder konstant bleibt, in dem die Dicke der Laufradschaufel (6) entsprechend profilartig gestaltet ist, wobei der Schaufeleintrittswinkel 1 einen Wert >40° aufweist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 29/28; F04D 29/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/28 (2006.01); F04D 29/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/30 (2013.01); F04D 29/284 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

C. PFLEIDERER: "Die Kreiselpumpen für Flüssigkeiten und Gase, pages 1-23,91-248, 352-393", 1961, SPRINGER-VERLAG, BERLIN

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1013938 A1 20000628; EP 1013938 B1 20010801; CA 2289785 A1 20000618; CA 2289785 C 20080122; DE 59801139 D1 20010906; ES 2160389 T3 20011101; US 6340291 B1 20020122

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59801139

2016-04-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141219

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151223

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160126

2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141218

2015-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141231

2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141218

2015-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141231

2015-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141231

2015-09-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150831

2015-08-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20141218

2015-07-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2014-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20131217

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20131213

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20131216

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20131218

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20131217

- Year of fee payment: 16

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: RECKERT, LOTHAR

- Free text: RECKERT, LOTHAR#OLDENDORFER STRASSE 13#29587 NATENDORF (DE) -TRANSFER TO- RECKERT, LOTHAR#OLDENDORFER STRASSE 13#29587 NATENDORF (DE)

2002-07-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2160389 T3

2001-10-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010918

2001-09-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2001-09-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59801139 20010906

2001-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-08-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2001-03-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2001-01-03 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: LOW SPECIFIC SPEED BLOWER ROTOR

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991102

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI