Global Patent Index - EP 1013940 A2

EP 1013940 A2 2000-06-28 - Valve arrangement

Title (en)

Valve arrangement

Title (de)

Ventilanordnung

Title (fr)

Arrangement de soupape

Publication

EP 1013940 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00108206 A

Priority

  • DE 19526459 A
  • EP 96108698 A

Abstract (en)

The valve arrangement has several valve units in series side-by-side, each with a base plate with internal valve channels, a main valve (13,14) with an electric actuator and channels communicating with valve channels in the adjacent vale unit's base plate. An electric drive unit (58) for the main valve actuators (17,17') mounted above and/or below the row of valve units with a circuit board parallel to the plane of the unit row is simultaneously connected to all actuators and has a field bus communications unit (67) and/or an electronic controller (69).

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Ventilanordnung vorgeschlagen, die mehrere in einer Reihenrichtung (4) Seite an Seite liegend aufgereihte und in einer gemeinsamen Aufreihungsebene (5) angeordnete Ventileinheiten (2) aufweist. Jede Ventileinheit umfaßt eine Grundplatte mit durchgehenden Speise- und Entlüftungskanälen (22, 23). Oberhalb und/oder unterhalb der Reihe von Ventileinheiten (2) befindet sich eine elektrische Ansteuereinheit (58) für die Betätigungseinrichtungen (17, 17') der Ventileinheiten. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F15B 13/00 (2006.01); F15B 13/08 (2006.01); F15B 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 13/0814 (2013.01); F15B 13/0825 (2013.01); F15B 13/0832 (2013.01); F15B 13/0853 (2013.01); F15B 13/0857 (2013.01); F15B 13/0867 (2013.01); F15B 13/0871 (2013.01); F15B 19/00 (2013.01); F15B 19/005 (2013.01); Y10T 137/5283 (2015.04); Y10T 137/87209 (2015.04)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0754866 A2 19970122; EP 0754866 A3 19980715; EP 0754866 B1 20010801; DE 19526459 A1 19970123; EP 1013940 A2 20000628; EP 1013940 A3 20011010; EP 1013940 B1 20031022; TW 304223 B 19970501; US 5765589 A 19980616

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-03-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-02-27 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59610791

- Effective date: 20131203

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131203

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120531

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120608

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120420

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110503

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-02-26 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091201

2010-02-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091201

2008-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080516

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-10-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040723

2004-08-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-11-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59610791 P 20031127

2003-10-22 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0754866 P

2003-10-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT NL

2002-07-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR IT NL

2001-10-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT NL

2000-09-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: STOLL, KURT, DR.

2000-09-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BEYER, DIETER

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000414

2000-06-28 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 754866

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT NL