Global Patent Index - EP 1013983 A2

EP 1013983 A2 2000-06-28 - Device for conveying fluid with reduced stirs and waves into a tank

Title (en)

Device for conveying fluid with reduced stirs and waves into a tank

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum verwirbelungsarmen Einbringen einer Flüssigkeit in einen Flüssigkeitsbehälter

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'apport à faibles remous de fluide dans un réservoir

Publication

EP 1013983 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99124981 A

Priority

DE 29822803 U

Abstract (en)

During a beer brewing process liquid carbon dioxide is released into a process liquid (12) under a gas atmosphere within an enclosed tank (10). The liquid carbon dioxide is released onto the top surface (34) of a discus-shaped float (32). The float top surface has a gentle camber allowing the liquid carbon dioxide to drain gently into the fluid surface (12) generating the minimum of turbulence.

Abstract (de)

Um die Reinheit einer Flüssigkeit, wie beispielsweise flüssigen Kohlendioxid für die Brauereiindustrie zu verbessern, umfaßt eine Vorrichtung (30) zum verwirbelungsarmen Einbringen der Flüssigkeit in einen Flüssigkeitsbehälter (10) einen ersten Strömungskörper (32), dessen Oberseite parallel zum Flüssigkeitsspiegel (12) in dessen Höhe (oder nahebei) verläuft bzw. zu allen Seiten im flachen Winkel in den Flüssigkeitsspiegel eintaucht; ferner steht die Vorrichtung mit einer Flüssigkeitszuleitung in Verbindung, die auf der Strömungskörperoberseite mündet. Dadurch wird erreicht, daß die zuzuführende Flüssigkeit in einem flachen Film über die Strömungskörperoberseite strömt und etwaige in Form von Mikrobläschen in der Flüssigkeit vorhandenes Gas (wie beispielsweise Sauerstoff) leicht zur Flüssigkeitsoberfläche gelangen und in die Gasatmosphäre oberhalb des Flüssigkeitsspiegels übertreten kann. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F16L 55/05

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B67D 7/06 (2010.01); B67D 7/36 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B67D 7/06 (2013.01); B67D 7/36 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29822803 U1 20000504; EP 1013983 A2 20000628; EP 1013983 A3 20020703

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050305

2004-11-17 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: DEVICE FOR CONVEYING FLUID WITH REDUCED STIRS AND WAVES INTO A TANK

2003-03-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-02-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021217

2002-07-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-07-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ENBW ENERGIE-VERTRIEBSGESELLSCHAFT MBH

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI