Global Patent Index - EP 1013989 A1

EP 1013989 A1 2000-06-28 - A PETROL-OXYGEN CUTTING AND WELDING ATOMIZER AND A TORCH WITH THE ATOMIZER

Title (en)

A PETROL-OXYGEN CUTTING AND WELDING ATOMIZER AND A TORCH WITH THE ATOMIZER

Title (de)

DÜSENEINHEIT FÜR SCHWEISSEN UND SCHNEIDEN MIT BENZIN UND SAUERSTOFF UND BRENNER MIT DIESER DÜSE

Title (fr)

ATOMISEUR DE SOUDAGE ET DE DECOUPAGE A ESSENCE ET OXYGENE ET TORCHE COMPORTANT CET ATOMISEUR

Publication

EP 1013989 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98925388 A

Priority

  • CN 9800097 W
  • CN 97250604 U

Abstract (en)

The invention relates to an atomizer for gasoline- oxygen cutting and welding and a cutting torch provided with the same, the atomizer comprises a body, a gasoline inlet, a preheated oxygen inlet, a gasoline fine-tube and a preheated oxygen fine-tube. The gasoline fine-tube enters the preheat oxygen fine-tube in the body of the atomizer. The energy of oxygen disperses the gasoline sent from the gasoline fine tube, forming a very fine fog, which then enters the cutting nozzle of the cutting torch, therefore the oxygen is sufficiently mixed with the atomized gasoline to obtaine an ideal flame. The invention further provides a cutting torch provided with the atomizer according to the invention. The atomizer could be placed in the connector of the cutting nozzle or the preheat oxygen tube, or in the cutting torch of a semi-automatic cutting machine to improve the working conditions. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23D 14/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23D 11/10 (2006.01); F23D 11/38 (2006.01); F23D 14/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23D 11/102 (2013.01); F23D 14/42 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9909353 A1 19990225; AU 734175 B2 20010607; AU 7755898 A 19990308; CN 2300471 Y 19981216; EP 1013989 A1 20000628; EP 1013989 A4 20010516; JP 2002540372 A 20021126

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-19 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040707

2003-07-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030602

2001-08-01 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: LIANG, GUANGQI

2001-08-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LIANG, GUANGQI

2001-05-16 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010330

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 23D 14/54 A, 7F 23D 11/10 B

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000310

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE