Global Patent Index - EP 1013996 A1

EP 1013996 A1 2000-06-28 - Gas tap for cooker with a safety valve actuation

Title (en)

Gas tap for cooker with a safety valve actuation

Title (de)

Gashahn für einen Kochherd mit einem Sicherheitventilantrieb

Title (fr)

Robinet à gaz avec un actionnement de l'électrovanne de sûreté

Publication

EP 1013996 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99500237 A

Priority

ES 9803188 U

Abstract (en)

The gas tap (1) for cookers with a safety valve (6) actuation, comprises a tap body (1a) a tap actuating shaft (2) vertically oriented in respect of the surface of the cooker hob, and a thrust transmission mechanism (3,4,5) from the actuating shaft to the safety valve (6). The valve closing member (8) is opened by manual actuation, and is horizontally oriented. An interior tap cavity (4a) is square-shaped, and comprises a vertical part (4a) in communication with a pushrod (3) of the actuating shaft (2), and a horizontal part (4b) in communication with the safety valve (6), for housing the thrust transmission member, which is a bow-shaped rocker (5). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23K 5/00; F16K 31/44; F16K 31/60; F24C 3/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23K 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23K 5/007 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

FR 2565667 A1 19851213 - MADEC MATER [FR]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1013996 A1 20000628; EP 1013996 B1 20030813; DE 69910343 D1 20030918; DE 69910343 T2 20040527; ES 1041705 U 19990716; ES 1041705 Y 19991216

INPADOC legal status


2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141210

2015-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141231

2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150701

2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141210

2015-09-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150831

2015-08-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20141210

2015-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69910343

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20131220

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20131218

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20131219

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131220

- Year of fee payment: 15

2004-08-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040514

2004-05-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-09-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69910343 P 20030918

2003-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-08-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-03-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2000-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000605

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI