Global Patent Index - EP 1014001 A2

EP 1014001 A2 2000-06-28 - Device to control electrically controlled apparatus, in particular electric cooking apparatus

Title (en)

Device to control electrically controlled apparatus, in particular electric cooking apparatus

Title (de)

Anordnung zur Steuerung von elektrisch ansteuerbaren Geräten, insbesondere Elektrokochgeräten

Title (fr)

Dispositif de commande d'appareils à commande électrique, notamment appareils de cuisson électriques

Publication

EP 1014001 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99125184 A

Priority

DE 19859105 A

Abstract (en)

The arrangement has at least one control element (5) mounted or able to be mounted on the outside of a panel (2), an associated holder for holding the control element on the panel and a sensor arrangement for interaction with a controller for detecting the position and/or positional change of the control element. The control element is a sliding element that automatically returns to a rest position and that moves along the panel in at least one direction (28,29).

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Anordnung zur Steuerung von elektrisch ansteuerbaren Geräten, insbesondere Elektrokochgeräten beschrieben. Diese insbesondere im Bereich von Glaskeramikfeldern von Elektroherden einsetzbare Anordnung hat mindestens ein an einer Außenseite (4) einer Platte (2) angeordnetes, manuell betätigbares Bedienelement, das bevorzugt durch eine magnetische Halteeinrichtung (15) berührungsfrei magnetisch auf der Platte festgehalten wird. Über eine Sensoreinrichtung (25) zur Erfassung der Lage und/oder Lageänderung des Bedienelementes und eine zugeordnete Steuereinrichtung können verschiedene Betriebsarten des Gerätes eingestellt werden. Erfindungsgemäß ist ein Bedienelement als selbsttätig in eine Ruhestellung zurückkehrender Schiebetaster ausgebildet, der in mindestens einer Verschiebungsrichtung (28, 29) entlang der Platte verschiebbar ist. Derartige Schiebetaster sind besonders leicht bedienbar und gut an eine zumindest teilweise digitale Weiterverarbeitung der Sensorsignale zu steuerwirksamen Signalen angepaßt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24C 7/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 7/08 (2006.01); H05B 3/74 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 3/746 (2013.01); F24C 7/083 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1014001 A2 20000628; EP 1014001 A3 20011004; EP 1014001 B1 20031203; AT 255712 T 20031215; DE 19859105 A1 20000629; ES 2212453 T3 20040716; US 6498326 B1 20021224

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20161221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161220

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151228

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20151222

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-12-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040503

2004-11-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040906

2004-10-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-08-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-07-28 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2212453 T3

2004-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: E.G.O. ELEKTRO-GERATEBAU G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20031231

2004-05-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-03-16 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-03-03 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040303

2004-03-03 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040303

2004-02-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040113

2004-01-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59907930 P 20040115

2004-01-14 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031231

2003-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031231

2003-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031231

2003-12-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031231

2003-12-17 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031217

2003-12-17 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031217

2003-12-17 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031217

2003-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-12-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-12-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-12-03 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031203

2003-12-03 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031203

2003-12-03 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031203

2002-06-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-05-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020306

2001-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-10-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 24C 7/08 A, 7H 05B 3/74 B

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI