Global patent index - EP 1014008 A2

EP 1014008 A2 2000-06-28 - Smoke ventilation system

Title (en)

Smoke ventilation system

Title (de)

Rauch-Wärme-Abzugsanlage

Title (fr)

Système de désenfumage

Publication

EP 1014008 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99111337 A

Priority

  • EP 99111337 A
  • EP 98124315 A

Abstract (en)

The system includes at least one sensor and an actuator, which are interconnected via a bus system, and connected to a central command unit. The system uses a LAN network or other bus system. The connected sensors and actuators have at least one node as a coupling link to the bus, or are connected as LAN nodes to the entire system. The bus nodes, which may be integrated into the bus nodes, or external to the nodes, perform control tasks, and protection measures in the event of failure.

Abstract (de)

Rauch- und Wärmeabzugsanlagen sind Bestandteile des vorbeugenden Brandschutzes in Gebäuden unterschiedlicher Nutzung, die im Brandfall sowohl Rauch, als auch Wärme abführen sollen, um Flucht- und Rettungswege frei zu halten und die Brandbeanspruchung von Gebäudeteilen zu minimieren. Die zu schaffenden Öffnungen sollen i.d.R. auch zur natürlichen Raumlüftung genutzt werden. Änderungen der Anlagenkonstellation, z.B. notwendig durch Nutzungsänderungen der Gebäude, erfordern in der bisher üblichen Technik einen hohen Aufwand. Um die Funktionssicherheit der Anlage zu erhöhen, die Zuordnung der einzelnen Komponenten äußerst variabel zu gestalten, sowie Energie- und Rohstoffresourcen durch die Minimierung der elektrischen Kabelverlegung zu schonen, werden die Komponenten bei erfindungsgemäßer Ausführung mit einem BUS - System untereinander und mit mindestens einer Zentralbefehlseinheit verbunden, bei gleichzeitiger Beibehaltung eines hohen Sicherheitsstandarts.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24F 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 11/0009 (2013.01); F24F 2011/0067 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1014008 A2 20000628; EP 1014008 A3 20030528

INPADOC legal status

2004-08-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040103

2004-03-25 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2004-02-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2003-05-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-05-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI