Global Patent Index - EP 1014009 A2

EP 1014009 A2 2000-06-28 - An air conditioner

Title (en)

An air conditioner

Title (de)

Klimaanlage

Title (fr)

Dispositif de conditionnement d'air

Publication

EP 1014009 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99125861 A

Priority

JP 36892098 A

Abstract (en)

This invention provides a separate type air conditioner separated into an indoor unit and an outdoor unit which includes a controller having a microcomputer in which a program for a cooling machine and a program for a cooling-and-heating machine are stored and a program switch for switching the program for the cooling machine and the program for the cooling-and-heating machine. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24F 11/02 (2006.01); F24F 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 11/006 (2013.01); F24F 2011/0064 (2013.01); F24F 2221/54 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1014009 A2 20000628; EP 1014009 A3 20030709; EP 1014009 B1 20061213; ES 2275327 T3 20070601; JP 2000193295 A 20000714; JP 3818786 B2 20060906

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20161111

- Year of fee payment: 18

2007-11-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070914

2007-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2275327 T3

2006-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): ES IT

2006-12-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KAZAMA, KAZUHIRO,MITSUBISHI ELECTR. ENG.CO.LTD.

2006-12-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MOCHIZUKI,SHIGENOBUMITSUBISHI ELECTR. ENG.CO.LTD.

2006-12-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SUGIYAMA, TOSHIYA,MITSUBISHI ELECTR. ENG.CO.LTD.

2006-11-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KAZAMA, KAZUHIRO,MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC ENG. CO.LTD.

2006-11-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MOCHIZUKI,SHIGENOBUMITSUBISHI ELECTRIC ENG.CO.LTD

2006-11-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SUGIYAMA, TOSHIYA,MITSUBISHI ELECTR. ENG. CO.LTD.

2006-10-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KAZAMA, KAZUHIRO, MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC ENG. CO.LTD

2006-10-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MOCHIZUKI, SHIGENOBU, MITSUBISHI ELEC.ENG. CO.LTD

2006-10-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SUGIYAMA, TOSHIYA, MITSUBISHI ELECTR. ENG. CO.LTD

2006-09-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA

2006-05-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA

2004-05-06 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-03-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): ES IT

2004-02-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031217

2003-07-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-07-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI