Global Patent Index - EP 1014011 A1

EP 1014011 A1 2000-06-28 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CONTROLLING AIR FLOW IN INDOOR MACHINE OF AIR CONDITIONER

Title (en)

METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CONTROLLING AIR FLOW IN INDOOR MACHINE OF AIR CONDITIONER

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR STEUERUNG DES LUFTSTROMES FÜR EINE INNENRAUMEINHEIT EINER KLIMAANLAGE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE REGULATION DES FLUX D'AIR DANS LA PARTIE INTERIEURE AUX LOCAUX D'UN CONDITIONNEUR D'AIR

Publication

EP 1014011 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98931045 A

Priority

  • JP 9803102 W
  • JP 21503797 A

Abstract (en)

There is provided an airflow control method and airflow controller for an air conditioner indoor unit capable of executing air conditioning so that indoor temperature distribution becomes uniform without any sense of airflow during heating operation. There are provided a turbofan 3 that has an axis extending in an anteroposterior direction and blows air taken in from a front surface side radially outwardly with respect to an axis inside a casing and a heat exchanger 5 disposed on the front surface side of the turbofan 3 inside the casing. The casing is provided with outlet ports for blowing air from the turbofan 3 in the vertical direction and the horizontal direction. During the heating operation, a control signal is outputted by a flap control section 10a to an upper flap stepping motor 41 and a left-hand flap stepping motor 44 so as to narrow the openings of the upper, right-hand and left-hand flaps and make the opening of the lower flap wider than the openings of the upper, right-hand and left-hand flaps. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 11/02; F24F 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24F 11/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 1/0014 (2013.01); F24F 2001/0048 (2013.01); F24F 2221/54 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1014011 A1 20000628; EP 1014011 A4 20020529; EP 1014011 B1 20050406; CN 1168936 C 20040929; CN 1265734 A 20000906; ES 2239805 T3 20051001; HK 1029388 A1 20050422; JP 3137042 B2 20010219; JP H1163626 A 19990305; WO 9908051 A1 19990218

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130711

2014-09-08 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20140908

2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130710

2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-04-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20140331

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120731

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120719

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120713

- Year of fee payment: 15

2006-03-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060110

2006-03-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-10-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2239805

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2005-04-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): ES FR IT

2002-05-29 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20020415

2002-05-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): ES FR IT

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000208

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): ES FR IT