Global Patent Index - EP 1014021 A2

EP 1014021 A2 2000-06-28 - Dryer for bulk material

Title (en)

Dryer for bulk material

Title (de)

Trockner für Schüttgut

Title (fr)

Sécheur de matériau en vrac

Publication

EP 1014021 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99125522 A

Priority

  • DE 19860236 A
  • DE 19904196 A

Abstract (en)

The drier has a conveyor with at least one flat element for carrying and transporting bulk material (2) of predefined thickness and at least one infrared radiator (3) mounted above the flat element for heating the bulk material. The flat element of the conveyor consists of heat conducting material and has heat-conducting protrusions (4,5,6) whose height is matched to the thickness of the bulk material layer.

Abstract (de)

Der Trockner weist eine Grundplatte (1) zum Tragen einer Schüttgutschicht (2) von vorgegebener Dicke auf. Die Schüttgutschicht wird durch Vibration der Grundplatte unter mindestens einem Infrarot-Strahler (3) hindurchbewegt. Die Grundplatte (1), die aus einem wärmeleitfähigen Material besteht, trägt wärmeleitfähige Erhebungen (4, 5), deren Höhe die Dicke der Schüttgutschicht (2) übersteigt. Sie tragen Wärme durch Wärmeleitung in die Grundplatte ein, so daß die Schüttgutschicht von oben durch Strahlung und von unten durch Wärmeleitung beheizt wird. Dadurch verkürzt sich die Trocknungszeit. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F26B 3/30; F26B 3/22; F26B 17/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F26B 3/22 (2006.01); F26B 3/30 (2006.01); F26B 17/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F26B 17/26 (2013.01); F26B 3/22 (2013.01); F26B 3/30 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1014021 A2 20000628; EP 1014021 A3 20010926

INPADOC legal status


2003-03-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020327

2002-07-18 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-06-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-09-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI