Global Patent Index - EP 1014027 A1

EP 1014027 A1 2000-06-28 - Condenser for vehicle air-conditioning systems

Title (en)

Condenser for vehicle air-conditioning systems

Title (de)

Verflüssiger für Fahrzeugklimaanlagen

Title (fr)

Condenseur pour systèmes de climatisation de véhicules

Publication

EP 1014027 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99830758 A

Priority

IT TO981076 A

Abstract (en)

A condenser for air conditioning systems for vehicles, comprising a pair of distributors (16, 18) and a plurality of tubes (14a-14n) extending between the distributors and having end portions (22a-22n) inserted into corresponding apertures (20) formed in the lateral walls of the distributors (16, 18). At least one of said tubes (14a-14n) has an end portion (22d, 22l, 22g) which divides the respective distributors (16, 18) in two chambers (16a, 16b, 16c, 18a, 18b). Said end portion (22d, 22l, 22g) has an aperture (28) in its lateral wall which puts the tube (14d, 14c, 14l) in fluid communication with only one of said chambers (16a, 16b, 16c, 18a, 18b). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28F 9/02; F28D 1/053

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25B 39/04 (2006.01); F28D 1/053 (2006.01); F28F 1/02 (2006.01); F28F 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28D 1/05391 (2013.01); F25B 39/04 (2013.01); F28F 1/025 (2013.01); F28F 9/0212 (2013.01); F28F 9/0282 (2013.01); F25B 2339/044 (2013.01); F25B 2500/01 (2013.01); F28D 2021/0084 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1014027 A1 20000628; AR 021580 A1 20020724; BR 9905957 A 20000926; IT 1305076 B1 20010410; IT TO981076 A1 20000623; IT TO981076 D0 19981223

INPADOC legal status


2001-07-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010203

2001-03-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-11-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000922

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000603

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI