Global patent index - EP 1014028 A1

EP 1014028 A1 2000-06-28 - Guidance, navigation and control system for missile

Title (en)

Guidance, navigation and control system for missile

Title (de)

Lenk,- Navigations- und Regelsystem für Flugkörper

Title (fr)

Système de guidage, de navigation et de commande pour missile

Publication

EP 1014028 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99124092 A

Priority

DE 19857895 A

Abstract (en)

The aircraft and the missile are connected to provide a launch facility and the aircraft has a target detection and identification unit. Data is downloaded via the link to the on board missile controller, such that data is relayed to the steering, navigation and processing stage. Both aircraft and missile have inputs from sensors.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Lenk-, Navigations- und Regelsystem für zielverfolgende Flugkörper (12) mit Sensor- und Signalverarbeitungsmitteln (14,16,18,20,22 bzw. 28,30) im Flugzeug (10), Sensor- und Signalverarbeitungsmitteln (42,44 bzw. 40) im Flugkörper (12) und Datenübertragungsmitteln (52) zwischen Flugzeug (10) und Flugkörper (12), sind die Sensor- und Signalverarbeitungsmittel (14,16,18,20,22 bzw. 28,30) im Flugzeug (10) und die Sensor- und Signalverarbeitungsmittel (42,44 bzw. 40) im Flugkörper (12) über eine Schnittstelle (52) im Startgerät und über drahtlose Datenübertragungsmittel ("Data Link" 54) in Datenaustausch und zu einem zusammenwirkenden System für die Lenkung, Navigation und Regelung des Flugkörpers (12) integriert. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41G 7/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41G 7/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41G 7/2206 (2013.01); F41G 7/2246 (2013.01); F41G 7/2286 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 19716025 A1 19981022 - BODENSEEWERK GERAETETECH [DE]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19857895 A1 20000621; EP 1014028 A1 20000628; EP 1014028 B1 20050629

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160701

2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151213

2016-09-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20160831

2016-08-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151214

2016-08-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20151213

2016-08-02 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2016-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59912218

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2016-06-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131213

2015-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131231

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150218

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-02-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141219

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-01-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141219

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141219

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121221

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-06-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060330

2006-04-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-10-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20050908

2005-09-06 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2005-08-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59912218

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-08-04

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-06-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2005-06-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-03-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DIEHL BGT DEFENCE GMBH & CO.KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-03-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030203

2001-03-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT SE

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000415

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI