Global patent index - EP 1014029 A2

EP 1014029 A2 2000-06-28 - Detector circuit

Title (en)

Detector circuit

Title (de)

Detektorschaltung

Title (fr)

Circuit détecteur

Publication

EP 1014029 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99124996 A

Priority

DE 19859394 A

Abstract (en)

The detector circuit (11) has a radiation sensitive sensor (10) connected to a signal amplifier (15). A capacitive high pass filter (14) between the two includes a series capacitor (25) with a high filter time constant. A low resistance circuit (31) is provided between the series capacitor and the signal amplifier which discharges the capacitor at a faster rate.

Abstract (de)

Die Detektorschaltung (11) eines strahlungsempfindlichen Sensors (10) mit kapazitiver Hochpaß-Kopplung (14) zwischen Vorverstärker (13) und Signalverstärker (15) wird wegen der großen Filter-Zeitkonstante des Längs-Kondensators (25) auch noch nach Beendigung einer Übererregung für längere Zeit (T2) blockiert, weil der Kondensator (25) nur langsam umgeladen wird und deshalb der ihm folgende Signalverstärker (15) zunächst noch übersteuert bleibt, bis der Kondensator (25) wieder auf einen Gleichspannungspegel im Aussteuerbereich (39) des Signalverstärkers (15) umgeladen ist. Diese Totzeitspanne (T2) wird jedoch auf einen kleinen Bruchteil (T1) verkürzt, wenn mit Beendigung der eingangsseitigen Übererregung der Kondensator (25) ausgangsseitig, also vor dem Signalverstärker (15), zum Potentialabbau über eine niederohmige Schaltstrecke (31) zwangsweise auf das - virtuelle - Massepotential am Verstärkereingang zurückgeführt wird. Solche Umladung kann außerdem softwaregesteuert ausgelöst werden, wenn über eine längere Zeitspanne hinweg keine verwertbaren Nutzsignale (17) aufgetreten sind, weil beispielsweise eine permanent hohe Aussteuerung des Sensors (10) zu einer zu starken Potentialverschiebung am Koppelkondensator (25) geführt hat. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42C 13/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42C 13/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42C 13/02 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1014029 A2 20000628; EP 1014029 A3 20001122; EP 1014029 B1 20020612; DE 19859394 A1 20000706; DE 19859394 C2 20020704; US 6300616 B1 20011009

INPADOC legal status

2006-11-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-22 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2006-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060701

2005-12-16 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051216

2005-02-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050222

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-12-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041228

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-11-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041129

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-06-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030313

2002-11-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-07-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59901714

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-07-18

2002-06-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR SE

2002-01-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011130

2002-01-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: REGENSBURGER, MARTIN

2001-08-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR SE

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001025

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR SE

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI