Global Patent Index - EP 1014175 A1

EP 1014175 A1 2000-06-28 - Method of preparing silver halide emulsion containing homogeneous and thin tabular crystals

Title (en)

Method of preparing silver halide emulsion containing homogeneous and thin tabular crystals

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung einer homogenen und dünne tafelförmige Körner enthaltenden Silberhalogenidemulsion

Title (fr)

Méthode de production d'émulsion à l'halogénure d'argent contenant des cristaux tabulaires homogènes et fins

Publication

EP 1014175 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98204367 A

Priority

EP 98204367 A

Abstract (en)

Method of preparing a photosensitive element containing a silver halide emulsion with homogeneous and thin tabular crystals, comprising the steps of: (1) forming silver halide nuclei by simultaneously adding an aqueous silver salt and a halide salt solution to a reaction vessel (a), containing an aqueous solution of a protective colloid, (2) transfering the dispersion of silver halide nuclei formed in vessel (a) to a mixing chamber (b) and diluting said dispersion, (3) growing in a growth chamber (c) said nuclei of the diluted dispersion by adding and mixing an aqueous silver salt and a halide salt solution and collecting the grown crystals in reaction vessel (a) which is a part of a closed circuitry together with the mixing and growth chambers (b) and (c), (4) transfering said silver halide crystal dispersion to mixing chamber (b) and diluting the dispersion, (5) further growing the silver halide crystals in growth chamber (c) and collecting the silver halide crystals in reaction vessel a), (6) concentrating the emulsion of silver halide crystals simultaneously with the step of growing in order to keep the emulsion level in reaction vessel (a) controlled. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03C 1/005

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03C 1/015 (2006.01); G03C 1/005 (2006.01); G03C 1/035 (2006.01); G03C 1/498 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03C 1/0051 (2013.01); G03C 1/015 (2013.01); G03C 1/49818 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

G03C 1/0051 + G03C 2200/43 + G03C 2001/0157 + G03C 2001/0156 + G03C 2001/03529

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1014175 A1 20000628; JP 2000187294 A 20000704

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040622

2004-03-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040209

2002-02-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AGFA-GEVAERT

2001-03-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001228

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI