Global patent index - EP 1014207 A1

EP 1014207 A1 2000-06-28 - Toner sequence to minimise noise

Title (en)

Toner sequence to minimise noise

Title (de)

Tonerreihenfolge zur Rauschverminderung

Title (fr)

Séquence de toner pour minimiser le bruit.

Publication

EP 1014207 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98204392 A

Priority

EP 98204392 A

Abstract (en)

A method and an apparatus for reproducing a continuous tone image by application of at least two different types of marking particles to a receiving substrate, the method including the steps of: subdividing the continuous tone image into image portions; determining a plurality of printing combinations, each printing combination optionally including a set of tone curves and including a printing sequence for applying the different types of marking particles to the receiving substrate; determining, for at least two printing combinations and for at least one selected image portion, visual quality characteristics (N1, N2, N3, G1, G2, G3) that depend on the selected image portion and on the printing combination; selecting, based on the visual quality characteristics, a selected printing combination for the selected image portion; printing the selected image portion according to the selected printing combination. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03G 13/01

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03G 13/01 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 13/01 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1014207 A1 20000628

INPADOC legal status

2003-01-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020702

2002-02-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: XEIKON NV

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-03-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AGFA-GEVAERT N.V.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-03-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: XEIKON NV

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-03-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE DE FR GB

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001228

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI