Global patent index - EP 1014220 A1

EP 1014220 A1 2000-06-28 - A fusing member for hot pressure fixing of toner particles and for transfusing toner particles

Title (en)

A fusing member for hot pressure fixing of toner particles and for transfusing toner particles

Title (de)

Schmelzeinrichtung für die Druck-Wärme-Fixierung und Schmelzübertragung von Tonerteilchen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de fusion pour le fixage à chaud sous pression et le transfert par fusion de particules de toner

Publication

EP 1014220 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98204368 A

Priority

EP 98204368 A

Abstract (en)

A fusing member comprising a support, and on the support, an outermost layer containing a silicone elastomer, having at most 5 % by weight of filler particles, the elastomer layer containing polyorganosiloxane having a swelling factor, SF, equal to or higher than 3 and a thickness between 5 and 500 mu m, both limits included and a second layer with an impurity absorbing material, closer to the support and immediately in contact with the outermost layer, the second layer being at least 40 mu m thick. Preferably the second layer has a silicone containing elastomer and contains at least 5 % by weight of metal oxide particles having a specific surface of 30 m<2>.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03G 15/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/2057 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] US 4372246 A 19830208 - AZAR JACK C, et al
  • [A] EP 0531011 A1 19930310 - XEROX CORP [US]
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 009, no. 080 (M - 370) 10 April 1985 (1985-04-10)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 009, no. 209 (M - 407) 27 August 1985 (1985-08-27)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1014220 A1 20000628

INPADOC legal status

2004-01-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030701

2003-09-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021022

2001-03-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE DE FR GB NL

2001-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001113

2000-11-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: XEIKON NV

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI