Global Patent Index - EP 1014231 A1

EP 1014231 A1 2000-06-28 - Wrist watch with capacitive coupling

Title (en)

Wrist watch with capacitive coupling

Title (de)

Armbanduhr mit kapazitiver Kopplung

Title (fr)

Montre-bracelet à couplage capacitif

Publication

EP 1014231 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98124363 A

Priority

EP 98124363 A

Abstract (en)

The watch and wrist strap (30) include: - a housing (32) fitted with a first electrical conductor (50) and an electrical circuit (36) connected to the first conductor (32), and; - a strap (34) including a second electrical conductor (42). The first and second electrical conductors (50,42) are arranged to form a non mechanical contact electrical connection. The housing (32) and the strap (34) have respectively first and second external surfaces (49,41). The first and second conductors (50,42) are arranged near to the external surfaces (49,41). The second external surface (41) is arranged near to the first external surface (49) so that the first and second conductors (50,42) form the two electrodes of a capacitor so that capacitive coupling is formed between the two conductors.

Abstract (fr)

La présente invention concerne une montre-bracelet (30) comprenant un boîtier (32) pourvu d'un premier conducteur électrique (50) et d'un circuit électrique (36) connecté audit premier conducteur électrique, et un bracelet (34) comprenant un deuxième conducteur électrique (42). Cette montre-bracelet est caractérisée en ce que les premier et deuxième conducteurs électriques sont agencés pour réaliser une liaison électrique sans contact mécanique et, plus précisément, par un couplage capacitif. Un avantage d'un tel agencement de la montre-bracelet est de réaliser une liaison électrique sans contact mécanique, c'est-à-dire une liaison électrique qui ne nécessite aucun agencement matériel externe supplémentaire en plus de l'articulation classique entre le bracelet et le boîtier. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04G 1/00; H01Q 1/27

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04G 21/04 (2013.01); G04G 99/00 (2010.01); H01Q 1/27 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04G 21/04 (2013.01); G04R 60/04 (2013.01); H01Q 1/273 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1014231 A1 20000628; EP 1014231 B1 20081001; DE 69840071 D1 20081113

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151123

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151119

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151119

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101222

2011-08-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20101222

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091125

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-09-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20090702

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081001

2008-12-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: ICB INGENIEURS CONSEILS EN BREVETS SA

2008-11-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69840071

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2008-11-13

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2008-10-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2008-10-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2008-10-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2008-01-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: G04G 1/06 20060101AFI20071128BHEP

2008-01-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: H01Q 1/27 20060101ALI20071128BHEP

2007-08-03 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1028457

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2003-03-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ETA SA MANUFACTURE HORLOGERE SUISSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-03-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001228

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI