Global patent index - EP 1014248 A2

EP 1014248 A2 2000-06-28 - Improved safety handwheel

Title (en)

Improved safety handwheel

Title (de)

Verbessertes Sicherheitshandrad

Title (fr)

Volant de sécurité amélioré

Publication

EP 1014248 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99125016 A

Priority

IT MI980819 U

Abstract (en)

An improved safety hand-wheel (1) comprises a contoured annular perimeter (2), made as a single piece, having a plurality of anatomically shaped angularly equispaced spokes (3). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G05G 1/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G05G 1/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G05G 1/10 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1014248 A2 20000628; EP 1014248 A3 20021113; IT 244451 Y1 20020311; IT MI980819 U1 20000621

INPADOC legal status

2010-01-06 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20090907

2007-05-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050428

2005-06-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050428

2003-07-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-04-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20030218

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI