Global Patent Index - EP 1014318 A2

EP 1014318 A2 2000-06-28 - Ticket issuing method, ticket issuing system and ticket collating method

Title (en)

Ticket issuing method, ticket issuing system and ticket collating method

Title (de)

Ticketausgabeverfahren und -system und Ticketkollationierverfahren

Title (fr)

Méthode et système d'édition de tickets et méthode de collationnement de tickets

Publication

EP 1014318 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99125264 A

Priority

JP 36072098 A

Abstract (en)

In a ticket issuing method, security data is first made from ticket issue request data and user identification data sent from user via a communication means and then, ticket image data is made from the ticket issue request data and by embedding the security data in the ticket image data in the invisible state, ticket printing data for printing ticket by user is made. The ticket printing data thus made is sent to user via a communication means. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07F 17/42; G07B 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04N 1/387 (2006.01); B41J 5/30 (2006.01); G06Q 10/10 (2012.01); G07B 1/00 (2006.01); G07B 1/02 (2006.01); G09C 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07B 1/02 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1014318 A2 20000628; EP 1014318 A3 20000920; EP 1014318 B1 20040519; DE 69917417 D1 20040624; DE 69917417 T2 20050602; JP 2000182086 A 20000630; KR 100433590 B1 20040531; KR 20000048145 A 20000725

INPADOC legal status


2011-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110701

2011-11-17 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69917417

- Effective date: 20110701

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110103

2011-09-09 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110831

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091222

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091221

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071217

2008-08-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071217

2006-12-13 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20061213

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-05-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050222

2005-02-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-06-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69917417 P 20040624

2004-05-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-05-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-05-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020322

2001-06-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2000-09-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 07F 17/42 A, 7G 07B 1/02 B, 7G 07D 7/12 B

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991217

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI