Global Patent Index - EP 1014321 A2

EP 1014321 A2 2000-06-28 - Method and apparatus for operating a retail terminal to display a price of an item in a number of different national currencies and/or different measurement systems

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for operating a retail terminal to display a price of an item in a number of different national currencies and/or different measurement systems

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Betrieb eines Verkaufsendgeräts mit Anzeige eines Preises in verschiedenen nationalen Münzwährungen und/oder verschiedenen Messystemen

Title (fr)

Méthode et dispositif pour l'opération d'un terminal de vente affichant le prix d'un article dans un nombre de monnaies nationales différentes et/ou des systèmes de mesure différents

Publication

EP 1014321 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99310283 A

Priority

  • US 21772398 A
  • US 21753798 A

Abstract (en)

A method of operating a retail terminal includes the step of displaying a characteristic of an item in a first classification type. The method also includes the step of generating a change-type control signal when a user of the retail terminal operates an input device associated with the retail terminal so as to input a classification type selection. Moreover, the method includes the step of displaying the characteristic of the item in a second classification type in response to generation of the change-system control signal <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07G 1/01; G07F 19/00; G07G 1/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07F 19/00 (2006.01); G07G 1/01 (2006.01); G07G 1/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 19/20 (2013.01); G07F 19/201 (2013.01); G07G 1/01 (2013.01); G07G 1/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1014321 A2 20000628; EP 1014321 A3 20050309

INPADOC legal status


2006-01-19 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2006-01-18 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050701

2005-11-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2005-03-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-03-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2005-03-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 07G 1/01 A

2005-03-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 07G 1/12 B

2005-03-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 07F 19/00 B

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI