Global Patent Index - EP 1014336 A2

EP 1014336 A2 2000-06-28 - Method and apparatus for generating noise, in particular switching-noise

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for generating noise, in particular switching-noise

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Erzeugen von Geräuschen, insbesondere von Schaltgeräuschen

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour générer du bruit, en particulier le bruit de commutation

Publication

EP 1014336 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99124031 A

Priority

DE 19860113 A

Abstract (en)

The switching noise generation method has a number of frequency values read out sequentially from a memory (1) and converted into corresponding electrical signal frequencies, which are supplied to an electroacoustic transducer (4) for providing an audible switching indication. An Independent claim for a switching noise generation device is also included.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Verfahren zum Erzeugung von Geräuschen, insbesondere von Schaltgeräuschen, ist vorgesehen daß Frequenzwerte sequentiell aus einem Speicher (1) ausgelesen werden, daß entsprechend der ausgelesenen Frequenzwerte elektrische Frequenzen erzeugt und mittels eines Schallwandlers (4) in entsprechende Schallwellen umgesetzt werden. Bei einer Vorrichtung zur Erzeugung von Geräuschen mit dem vorstehenden Verfahren, ist vorgesehen, daß sie die folgende Einheiten umfaßt: eine Speichereinheit (1) zum Speichern von Frequenzwerten, eine Frequenzerzeugungseinheit (3), die Frequenzen entsprechend eingelesener Frequenzwerte erzeugt, eine Verarbeitungseinheit (2) zum sequentiellen Auslesen der Frequenzwerte aus der Speichereinheit und zum sequentiellen Einlesen in die Frequenzerzeugungseinheit (3), eine Wandlereinheit (4) die mit den in der Frequenzerzeugungseinheit (3) erzeugten Frequenzen angesteuert wird und die erzeugten Frequenzen in Schallwellen umwandelt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G10K 15/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10K 15/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10K 15/02 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1014336 A2 20000628; EP 1014336 A3 20040204; DE 19860113 A1 20000706; DE 19860113 B4 20040318

INPADOC legal status


2005-05-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040805

2004-10-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-02-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2002-01-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI