Global Patent Index - EP 1014340 A2

EP 1014340 A2 2000-06-28 - Method and device for processing noisy audio signals

Title (en)

Method and device for processing noisy audio signals

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Verarbeitung rauschbehafteter Schallsignale

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif de traitement des signaux audio contenant du bruit

Publication

EP 1014340 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99125575 A

Priority

DE 19859174 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19859174C1] The method involves taking a predetermined section of the acoustic signal to be processed and, within this section, detecting approximately periodic signal profiles. Correlations between the signal profiles are determined. Correlated signal components are associated with an active component of the acoustic signal. Uncorrelated signal components are associated with noise components. The correlation between signal profiles is determined using a non-linear noise reduction process in deterministic systems. Independent claims also cover an apparatus for carrying out the method.

Abstract (de)

Zur Signalverarbeitung eines Schallsignals y, in dem eine Redundanz enthalten ist, die hauptsächlich aus annähernden Wiederholungen von Signalprofilen besteht, werden die Signalprofile erfaßt und Korrelationen zwischen den Signalprofilen innerhalb von Abschnitten des Schallsignals erfaßt. Korrelierte Signalanteile werden einem Leistungsanteil und unkorrelierte Signalanteile einem Rauschanteil des Schallsignals zugeordnet. Die Korrelationen zwischen den Signalprofilen werden mit Verfahren der nichtlinearen Rauschreduzierung in deterministischen Systemen in rekonstruierten Vektorräumen ermittelt, die auf der Zeitdomäne basieren. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G10L 21/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10L 15/02 (2006.01); G10L 15/20 (2006.01); G10L 21/0208 (2013.01); G10L 21/0216 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10L 21/0208 (2013.01); G10L 2021/02163 (2013.01); H04R 2225/43 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19859174 C1 20000504; EP 1014340 A2 20000628; EP 1014340 A3 20010718; JP 2000194400 A 20000714; US 6502067 B1 20021231

INPADOC legal status


2009-01-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080701

2008-05-14 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: MAX-PLANCK-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FOERDERUNG DER WISSENS

2002-04-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011115

2001-07-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI